JEANNE MARIE GUNN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GIVING RELIEF TO THE NEEDY AND DESERVING POOR, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST THOSE PROFESSING THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
- Eritrea
- Italy
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 19 February 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERALD ARTHUR MILLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sandra Spooner | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Johnson | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fr Paul Fox | Trustee | 25 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Johnstone | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA CURNOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.83k | £35.92k | £1.80m | £45.94k | £49.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.68k | £30.51k | £1.79m | £39.89k | £46.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £4.87k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £42.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.75m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £1.79m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £2.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £3.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £1.78m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £2.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £576 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1974 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 APR 2021
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF NEEDY AND DESERVING POOR, ESPECIALLY BUT NO EXCLUSIVLEY ROMAN CATHOLICS IN RAYLEIGH, ESSEX AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
ROMAN CATHOLIC PARISH OF RAYLEIGH AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 THE WALK
HULLBRIDGE
HOCKLEY
SS5 6LW
- Phone:
- 01702231925
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window