COUNCIL FOR BRITISH ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTH WEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In furtherance of its aims to encourage involvement in regional heritage and archaeology, CBA South West produces two newsletters/journals and holds two or three open meetings each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- Plymouth City
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Torbay
Governance
- 05 December 1974: Standard registration
- C B A SOUTH WEST (Working name)
- COUNCIL FOR BRITISH ARCHAEOLOGY, GROUP 13 (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Caradoc Peters | Chair |
|
||||||
KATHERINE COLLINS | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
HENRY ROTHWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £533 | £131 | £123 | £101 | £95 | |
|
Total expenditure | £602 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2023 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 July 2023 | 610 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2023 | 975 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH OCTOBER 1973
Charitable objects
(A) TO ENSURE THE SAFEGUARDING OF ALL KINDS OF ARCHAEOLOGICAL MATERIAL AND TO URGE THE STRENGHENING OF EXISTING MEASURES FOR THE CARE OF ANCIENT AND HISTORIC BUILDINGS, MONUMENTS AND ANTIQUITIES. (B) TO STIMULATE INFORMED INTEREST IN THE MONUMENTS AND RECORDS OF THE PAST. (C) TO FORWARD ARCHAEOLOGICAL RESEARCH AND ITS PUBLICATION. (D) TO PROMOTE THE INTERCHANGE OF IDEAS ON ALL ASPECTS OF ARCHAEOLOGY. (E) TO OBTAIN RECOGNITION OF ARCHAEOLOGY IN EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
CORNWALL, DEVON, SOMERSET, GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND THE FORMER COUNTY OF AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 Brentford Avenue
PLYMOUTH
PL5 4HD
- Phone:
- 07495025794
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window