Financial history THE INSTITUTION OF LIGHTING PROFESSIONALS

Charity number: 268547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £777.29k £489.99k £552.62k £786.46k £860.02k
Total expenditure £853.73k £635.43k £640.57k £715.71k £789.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.65k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £37.92k N/A £17.59k £21.22k £36.08k
Income - Charitable activities £710.95k N/A £512.90k £758.06k £810.71k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.42k N/A £22.14k £7.18k £13.23k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £781.62k N/A £573.00k £646.54k £702.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.67k N/A £12.74k £18.94k £34.72k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £54.83k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £11.36k £10.14k £9.18k
Expenditure - Other £52.43k N/A £54.83k £50.23k £51.84k