Governing document THE INSTITUTION OF LIGHTING PROFESSIONALS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JANUARY 1928 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 23 SEPTEMBER 1985, 19 SEPTEMBER 1988 AND 15 JUNE 2010. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND IMPROVE THE SCIENCE AND ART OF LIGHTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND FOR THIS PURPOSE TO FACILITATE THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND IDEAS ON THE SUBJECT AMONG MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTION AND OTHERWISE AND IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.