AGE CONCERN BISHOP'S STORTFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of day centre facilities for older people on 4 - 5 days each week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £47,400 from 6 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 December 1974: Standard registration
- AGE CONCERN - BISHOPS STORTFORD (Working name)
- BISHOP'S STORTFORD OLD PEOPLES' WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Horwood | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Pook | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Phillip Godfrey | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.06k | £155.16k | £109.23k | £286.19k | £152.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.01k | £131.25k | £120.11k | £149.09k | £147.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.62k | £22.54k | £48.01k | £46.36k | £47.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH OCTOBER 1974 AND AS AMENDED 8 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER, AS IS NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN THE TOWN OF BISHOP'S STORTFORD.
Area of benefit
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
22A APTON ROAD
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
CM23 3SN
- Phone:
- 01279504748
- Email:
- office@thenewaptoncentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window