Accounts and annual returns THE AFRICAN FINE ART GALLERY

Charity Number: 268580
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2017 18 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 24 July 2017 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required