IXWORTH THORPE TOWN ESTATE CHARITIES

Charity number: 268598
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Funds maintenance/repair work at Ixworth Thorpe Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010

Total income: £16
Total expenditure: £9,515

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 December 1974: Standard registration
  • 27 April 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • JOHN WRIGHT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £30 £250 £227 £35 £16
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £9.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 12 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 02 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 24 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
P.R.22 P. 127 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 7 NOVEMBER 1893 AND 15 SEPTEMBER 1936.
Charitable objects
1) IN OR TOWARDS THE REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH. 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF IXWORTH THORPE.
Area of benefit
FORMER ANCIENT PARISH OF IXWORTH THORPE
Registration history
  • 31 December 1974 : Standard registration
  • 27 April 2012 : Removed