Governing document NEW VENTURE PRODUCTIONS
Charity number: 268607

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/10/1973 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 02/11/2011 as amended on 21 Oct 2017 as amended on 18 Nov 2020 as amended on 18 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.