Trustees NEW VENTURE PRODUCTIONS

Charity number: 268607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Hadley Trustee 22 November 2024
None on record
Alison McMillan Puri Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
Katie Brownings Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
Peter Meekings Trustee 05 January 2019
None on record
JEREMY LYNE Trustee 12 October 2008
None on record
IAN BLACK Trustee 30 October 2007
None on record