BARTS RENAL PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 268619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £20

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 December 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BARTLEN KIDNEY MACHINE PATIENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TINA HARLOW Trustee
THE BARTLEN KIDNEY PATIENTS HOLIDAY DIALYSIS TRUST
Received: On time
SPENCER MACDONALD Trustee
THE BARTLEN KIDNEY PATIENTS HOLIDAY DIALYSIS TRUST
Received: On time
MICHELLE WICKWAR Trustee
THE BARTLEN KIDNEY PATIENTS HOLIDAY DIALYSIS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £101 £0 £15 £60 £20
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 March 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
62 BONNINGTONS
BRENTWOOD
CM13 2TN
Phone:
01277210584
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available