Trustees 5TH WOODBRIDGE SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 268625

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Bell | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Holley | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Perry | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Russell | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Notcutt | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Douse | Trustee | 26 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAGGIE ULPH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.