THE SHARON TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young peoples camps, youth work & Bible conferences, Christian missions in Gt Britain & abroad. Upkeep of elderly peoples homes, gospel halls, churches, distribution of Bibles & Christian literature. Financial help for a home for street children in Africa, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 10 January 1975: Standard registration
- 15 May 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SHARON TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.37k | £8.98k | £1.34k | £561 | £145.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.78k | £48.30k | £53.72k | £38.73k | £143.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 02 May 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 29 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 21 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | 16 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | 05 September 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 15 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | 06 September 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH NOVEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEDULE TO TRUST DEED OF 4TH NOVEMBER 1974).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window