STOKE BISHOP COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 268751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity exists to provide a meeting place for local groups and to act as a venue for local functions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £34,004
Total expenditure: £19,609

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 October 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER CLOUGH Chair
LITTLE PARC OWLES TRUST
Received: On time
SHARON PARSONS Trustee 21 January 2013
None on record
DANIEL YORK Trustee
None on record
RICHARD PARSONS Trustee
None on record
JOE SCAIFE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.08k £14.49k £24.01k £35.15k £34.00k
Total expenditure £29.27k £10.00k £11.04k £15.72k £19.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JUNE 1974
Charitable objects
SHALL HOLD THE TRUST PROPERTY UPON TRUST AS A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF A COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION FORMED TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STOKE BISHOP BRISTOL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE STOKE BISHOP BRISTOL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Registration history
  • 11 October 1996 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
1 Druid Stoke Avenue
Bristol
BS9 1DB
Phone:
01179173000