ABBEYFIELD (DORCHESTER) SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of and managing a home in Dorchester for elderly people who have individual bed sitting rooms. Meals are provided by a resident housekeeper.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 23 January 1975: Standard registration
- 02 January 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 02 January 2014: Funds transferred to 200719 THE ABBEYFIELD SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.91k | £80.30k | £94.83k | £87.51k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.92k | £82.47k | £92.22k | £90.93k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 13 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 07 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 07 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 25 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 13 September 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 15 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 13 December 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/08/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/04/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF AND CARE OF ELDERLY PERSONS OF ALL CLASSES SUFFERING FROM THE DISABILITIES OF OLD AGE OR OTHERWISE IN NEED.2. THE SPREADING OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES TO ALL HUMAN RELATIONSHIPS AND THE APPLICATION OF HUMANITARIAN AIMS TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY.3. TO PROVIDE FURTHER EDUCATION IN TE SPHERE OF VOLUNTARY WORK, SOCIAL WORK AND SIMILAR ACTIVITEIS SO AS TO INCULATE THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
DORCHESTER AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window