THAMES VALLEY SPECIAL CONSTABULARY WELFARE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE HELP IN TIMES OF NEED
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 23 January 1975: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kieren James Moore | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Keith Morley-Smith | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maria Hepworth | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE ADAMS | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.20k | £243 | £9.91k | £1.75k | £1.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.64k | £2.63k | £96 | £1.71k | £1.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1ST JANUARY 1974 AS AMENDED 24TH NOVEMBER 1974, 13TH JULY 1980 AND 23RD JUNE 1985, AMENDED 16 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE THAMES VALLEY SPECIAL CONSTABULARY OR THEIR DEPENDANTS AND RETIRED SPECIAL CONSTABLES OF THE FIVE CONSTITUENT FORCES OR THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDTIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
THAMES VALLEY CONSTABULARY AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THAMES VALLEY POLICE
ACCOUNTS DEPARTMENT
PO BOX 238
KIDLINGTON
OX5 1XS
- Phone:
- 01865855461
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window