ASHILL (DEVON) VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leisure, Social and community use within the area of benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 16 January 1975: Standard registration
- ASHILL VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- PUBLIC HALL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Beauchamp | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Doubleday | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ashworth | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Rackham | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Walker | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Tonge | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Parks | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rob Tootill | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Darby | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Terry Edwards | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tony Murphy | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Hebly | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Viv Perry | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Becky Darby | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.91k | £3.01k | £17.84k | £27.85k | £23.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.07k | £5.97k | £14.71k | £28.99k | £22.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.44k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 25 January 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 20TH MARCH 1928 AND AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 MAY 2008.
Charitable objects
(1) SUBJECT TO THIS CLAUSE, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (2) IF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IS NO LONGER REQUIRED FOR THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE AREA OF BENEFIT, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY WILL BE THE PROMOTION OF GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
ASHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashill Village Hall
Ashill
CULLOMPTON
EX15 3NL
- Phone:
- 07955200369
- Email:
- terrye4445@gmail.com
- Website:
-
ashillvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window