CHARITY OF SAMUEL CLOUTING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the education of girls under the age of 25 years who(or one or both of whose parents )are resident in the Ecclesiastical parish of Kelsale with Carlton and are in need of financial assistance To provide special benefits for any Church of England Sunday School in the Ecclesiastical parish of Kelsale with Carlton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Nathan Preece | Chair | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Cheryl Audrey Payne | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Nigel Patrick Pite | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Jacqui Studd | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
David May | Trustee | 31 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.79k | £1.82k | £1.86k | £63 | £2.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.60k | £2.79k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 November 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17TH JULY 1978
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO OR ONE OR BOTH OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KELSALE WITH CARLTON AND ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. B) TO PROVIDE SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR ANY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SUNDAY SCHOOL IN THE SAID PARISH. C) TO PROVIDE SUC SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR ANY VOLUNTARY SCHOOL IN OR SERVING THE SAID PARISH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KELSALE WITH CARLTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 THE VINES
KELSALE
SAXMUNDHAM
IP17 2PU
- Phone:
- 01728602113
- Email:
- david.may602@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window