THE ABBEYFIELD (CAMBORNE) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING SUPPORTED SHELTERED HOUSING FOR INDEPENDENT ELDERLY PEOPLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 10 February 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TREVE HARVEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nigel Druce | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rowland Joseph | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew PARSONS | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Roger Bunt | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.01k | £92.16k | £92.20k | £90.81k | £130.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.46k | £94.69k | £25.30k | £108.69k | £149.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 238 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH DECEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF AND CARE OF ELDERLY PERSONS OF ALL CLASSES SUFFERING FROM THE DISABILITIES OF OLD AGE OR OTHERWISE IN NEED. 2. THE SPREADING OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES TO ALL HUMAN RELATIONSHIPS AND THE APPLICATION OF HUMANITARIAN AIMS TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY. 3. TO PROVIDE FURTHER EDUCATION IN THE SPHERE OF VOLUNTARY WORK, SOCIAL WORK AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES SO AS TO INCULCATE THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Treveor
33 Basset Road
CAMBORNE
Cornwall
TR14 8SH
- Phone:
- 01209713456
- Email:
- abbeyfield621@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window