READING FOUNDATION FOR ART

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purchase of works of art or other objects of archaeological historical or scientific interest for the benefit of the public in the permanent collection maintained by Reading Borough Council
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Reading
Governance
- 28 January 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILES MARK RUPERT BLAGDEN | Chair | 09 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
William Gornall-King | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Katie Newman | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steve Woodford | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Clausen | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Johannes von Stumm | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAT JORDAN EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JIM ATTEWELL - Vice Chairperson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID DALLAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.80k | £6.09k | £15.34k | £8.92k | £101.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.76k | £2.80k | £13.75k | £10.93k | £8.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 15TH NOVEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
THE PURCHASE OF WORKS OF ART OR OTHER OBJECTS OF ARCHEOLOGICAL HISTORICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PERMANENT COLLECTION MAINTAINED BY READING CORPORATION.
Area of benefit
READING
Contact information
- Address:
-
READING MUSEUM
THE TOWN HALL
BLAGRAVE STREET
READING
BERKS
RG1 1QH
- Phone:
- 01189373400
- Email:
- rffa@readingmuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window