THE FRIENDS OF SWANTON MORLEY VC PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISE MONEY FOR ITEMS FOR SCHOOL EG ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND, TRIM TRIAL, GAMES, subsidising school trips
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 January 1975: Standard registration
- SWANTON MORLEY PTA (Working name)
- SWANTON MORLEY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Burlingham | Chair | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Rose Holland | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amber Scott-Curtis | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Eloise Pitcher | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Richards | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/09/2019 | 12/09/2020 | 12/09/2021 | 12/09/2022 | 12/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £1.20k | £1.50k | £4.80k | £2.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £400 | £875 | £599 | £809 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 September 2023 | 18 August 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 September 2019 | 30 June 2021 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/11/1974 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY: A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
SWANTON MORLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swanton Morley Primary School
Manns Lane
Swanton Morley
DEREHAM
Norfolk
NR20 4PX
- Phone:
- 01362637219
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window