IRCHESTER SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charities objectives are to maintain and provide a recreation ground for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of Irchester in Northamptonshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 27 May 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR COLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE SARAH COTTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £257.21k | £107.24k | £194.84k | £234.99k | £292.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £255.32k | £100.90k | £203.02k | £225.74k | £156.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £13.08k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 20TH JUNE 1966
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITATS OF THE PARISH OF IRCHESTER AS THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL TINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IRCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
IRCHESTER SPORTS ASSOCIATION
ALFRED STREET
IRCHESTER
WELLINGBOROUGH
NN29 7DR
- Phone:
- 01933312877
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window