HISTON AND IMPINGTON BROOK PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER-FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to provide additional goods and services for the pupils of the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 30 January 1975: Standard registration
- HISTON AND IMPINGTON BROOK PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- HISTON AND IMPINGTON JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- HISTON JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Cooper | Chair | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gurdeep Kaur Kalsi | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katy Harbottle | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Thomas Bakker | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Rachel Barker | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Priti Morzaria | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.70k | £5.36k | £5.78k | £10.15k | £16.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.49k | £4.50k | £9.13k | £5.69k | £13.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOV 1974 AS AMENDED ON 06 NOV 1980 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 1992 AS AMENDED ON 09 NOV 2000 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAR 2017 as amended on 20 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE HISTON JUNIOR SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
HISTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
HistonImpingtonBrookPrimarySchool
The Green
Histon
CAMBRIDGE
CB24 9JA
- Phone:
- 01223712192
- Email:
- office@brookprimary.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window