THE ABBEYFIELD GREAT MISSENDEN AND DISTRICT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sheltered accommodation for the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 28 February 1975: Standard registration
- ABBEYFIELD HOUSE GREAT MISSENDEN (Working name)
- THE ABBEYFIELD GREAT MISSENDEN DISTRICT SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Muriel Fensome | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Meron Rudolph Jacyna | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lola Brock Meakin | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Stuart | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Hall | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arun Suman | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE MACKAY | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUE BOTTOMLEY | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.65k | £248.35k | £258.31k | £283.01k | £315.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.57k | £241.25k | £278.68k | £282.60k | £327.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1974 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27TH SEPTEMBER 2004 as amended on 13 May 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF AND CARE OF ELDERLY PERSONS OF ALL CLASSES SUFFERING FROM THE DISABILITIES OF OLD AGE OR OTHERWISE IN NEED.2. THE SPREADING OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES TO ALL HUMAN RELATIONSHIPS AND THE APPLICATION OF HUMANITARIAN AIMS TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY.3.TO PROVIDE FURTHER EDUCATION IN THE SPHERE OF VOLUNTARY WORK, SOCIAL WORK AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES SO AS TO INCULCATE THE PRINICIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP.4.SUCH OTHER PURPOSES RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE AS THE SOCIETY SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
GREAT MISSENDEN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ABBEYFIELD HOUSE
LINK ROAD
GREAT MISSENDEN
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
HP16 9AE
- Phone:
- 01494865026
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window