Trustees THE ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY TRUST FUND
Charity number: 268893

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Graeme Turnbull | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Drupad Trivedi | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janice Haines | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bhavik Patel | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lee Dingwall | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leon Barron | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul O'Nion | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Karen Jane Faulds | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melanie Bailey | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zoe Joanna Ayres | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Royston Goodacre | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Hilborne | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacquin Wilford-Brown | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.