CAREW POLE GARDEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust owns these historic woodland gardens, listed Grade 2*, based on a design by Humphrey Repton which adjoin Antony House, Cornwall (a National Trust property), which are regularly open to the public. The gardens are also used for the purposes of research, with a view to furthering the study and science of botany and the improvement of the methods and practice of horticulture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cornwall
Governance
- 28 January 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR RICHARD | Chair |
|
||||||||
Tremayne John Carew Pole | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Stamford Timothy John Galsworthy | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
SIR RALPH FERRERS ALEXANDER VYVYAN | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
LADY Mary Carew Pole DCVO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.70k | £99.88k | £114.67k | £109.09k | £107.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.14k | £115.35k | £126.02k | £141.17k | £136.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST JANUARY 1975
Charitable objects
AS AND FOR A GARDEN FOR THE ONJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESEARCH (BY THE GROWTH AND PROPAGATION OF TREES AND PLANTS) WITH A VIEW TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE STUDY AND SCIENCE OF BOTANY AND THE INCREASE OF KNOWLEDGE IN RESPECT THEREOF AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE METHODS AND PRACTICE OF HORTICULTURE.
Area of benefit
ANTONY HOUSE TORPOINT CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ESTATE OFFICE
ANTONY
TORPOINT
PL11 3AB
- Phone:
- 01752 815303
- Email:
- william@antonyestate.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window