Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL EYE INFIRMARY PLYMOUTH

Charity number: 268980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.54k £112.69k £166.18k £363.19k £101.79k
Total expenditure £4.84k £13.22k £627 £473 £32.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A