TEMPLE GUITING VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running village hall. Providing recreation facilities. Organising recreational events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 March 1975: Standard registration
- TEMPLE GUITING RECREATION SOCIETY (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Mary Mather | Chair | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Morrissey | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN LITTLEWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.48k | £2.42k | £3.47k | £5.37k | £5.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.36k | £3.14k | £3.37k | £3.35k | £6.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEED DATED 4TH FEBRUARY 1985
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF TEMPLE GUITING, FORD, KINETON, CUTSDEAN, BARTON AND TADDINGTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TEMPLE GUITING CUTSDEAN FORD KINETON BARTON AND TADDINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 THE SHERRY
TEMPLE GUITING
CHELTENHAM
GL54 5RP
- Phone:
- 01451850541
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window