Accounts and annual returns LANGBOURN & DOMINICOS LODGE NO.5252 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 269034
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 17 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 28 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required