RELATE ELMBRIDGE MARRIAGE GUIDANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 26 March 1975: Standard registration
- 14 November 2003: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 November 2003: Funds transferred to 1079270 RELATE WEST SURREY
- ELMBRIDGE MARRIAGE GUIDANCE COUNCIL (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND NOVEMBER 1974 AS AMENDED 12TH JUNE 1989 AND 5TH FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE INSTITUTION OF MARRIAGE AND COMPARABLE RELATIONSHIPS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND SEXUAL RELATIONSHIPS AND WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING PERSONAL RESPONSIBILITIES AND ENRICHING FAMILY LIFE. 2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF ALL SUCH RESEARCH. 3) TO SAFEGUARD AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN AND TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAK-UP OF MARRIAGE, OR COMPARABLE RELATIONSHIPS. 4) TO BECOME AND REMAIN A CONSTITUENT SOCIETY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION OF NATIONAL RELATE MARRIAGE GUIDANCE SO LONG AS THE OBJECTS REMAIN CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.