Financial history THE ABBEYFIELD UXBRIDGE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 269062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £362.59k £362.59k £329.69k £407.00k £359.29k
Total expenditure £406.43k £406.43k £423.09k £408.76k £420.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A