BRITTANIA HINDU (SHIVA) TEMPLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are 1. The establishment of a hindu (Shiva) temple or temples where the rituals are to be conducted with special emphasis on saivism according to the tradition in Tamil-nadu and Sri Lanka 2. The propagation of hindu religioon 3. other purposes conducive to the advance ment of Hindu religion in general
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 07 April 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mailvaganam Perinpanathan | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
PARAMANATHAN BARTHIPAN | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Selliah Sothilingam | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr VASANAM PALLI NARAYANA RAO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHIRAVELU NAGARAJAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
APPATHURAI VAIRAVAMOORTHY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £535.12k | £384.56k | £419.79k | £458.69k | £487.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £375.06k | £259.56k | £277.50k | £329.05k | £424.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £296.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £237.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £100.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £274.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2024 | 272 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 AUG 1974 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 1975 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUL 1976 AS AMENDED ON 18 AUG 1996 AS AMENDED ON 28 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
1. ESTABLISHED OF A HINDU (SAIVA) TEMPLE OR TEMPLES WHERE THE RITUALS ARE TO BE CONDUCTED WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON SAIVISM ACCORDING TO THE TRADITION IN TAMILNADU AND CEYLON. 2. PROPAGATION OF HINDU RELIGION. 3. THE ESTABLISHING AND RUNNING OF SCHOOLS, CONDUCTING RELIGIOUS CLASSES AND RELIGIOUS MUSIC. 4. OTHER PURPOSES CONDUCIVE TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF HINDU RELIGION IN GENERAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRITTANIA HINDU (SHIVA) TEMPLE
200A ARCHWAY ROAD
LONDON
N6 5BA
- Phone:
- 02083489835
- Website:
-
highgatehillmurugan.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window