THE HENLEAZE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Henleaze Sociey is an amenity group looking for ways of improving the Henleaze area so that it is a good place to live in. The Society monitors planning applications, supports local activities, finds ways of improving parks and open spaces and the local shopping centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 26 March 1975: Standard registration
- HENLEAZE SOCIETY (Previous name)
- THE HENLEAZE NEIGHBOURHOOD SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Mary Furber | Chair | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael Batten | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Holden | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Snary | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Skinner | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Edward Thomas | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|||||
MR TERRY MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.45k | £7.67k | £6.60k | £6.48k | £7.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.33k | £4.21k | £8.29k | £6.68k | £6.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AMENDED 9TH NOVEMBER 1974 AND NOVEMBER 26TH 1991, AND 30 OCTOBER 1997 as amended on 26 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF HENLEAZE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE AND TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE SAID NEIGHBOURHOOD; ALSO TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS OF THE INHABITANTS OF HENLEAZE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
HENLEAZE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Carmarthen Road
BRISTOL
BS9 4DU
- Phone:
- 0117 9623383
- Email:
- ths.newsletter@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window