BLANDFORD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR STUDENT EXCHANGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At the moment the charity's activities are 'on hold'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Dorset
Governance
- 25 March 1975: Standard registration
- 18 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- B D S S E (Working name)
- THE BLANDFORD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR STUDENT EXCHANGE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £653 | £478 | £564 | £511 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9 | £0 | £0 | £51 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 15 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 19 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 16 February 2007 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 29 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH OCTOBER 1969 AS AMENDED ON 30TH OCTOBER 1974 AND SCHEME OF 7TH APRIL 1976
Charitable objects
ARRANGE, SUPPORT OR ENCOURAGE EXCHANGES FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES BETWEEN YOUNG PEOPLE OVERSEAS AND THOSE OF BLANDFORD AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
BLANDFORD AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window