Financial history THE CASTLE EATON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 269083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.88k £24.15k £19.52k £9.79k £7.75k
Total expenditure £6.38k £10.42k £4.62k £10.54k £11.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.62k £12.76k N/A N/A