Accounts and annual returns MILTON KEYNES OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE LIMITED

Charity Number: 269084
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 February 2007 16 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required