THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF GLOVERS OF LONDON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF GLOVERS OF LONDON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.87k | £139.11k | £107.62k | £94.22k | £87.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.66k | £119.82k | £91.48k | £119.21k | £117.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST JANUARY 1975 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 NOVEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN LIVERYMEN OR FREEMAN OF THE COMPANY OR THE NECESSITOUS WIDOWS, ORPHANS OR DEPENDENTS OF DECEASED LIVERYMEN OR FREEMEN OF THE COMPANY. (B) THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN IN THE EMPLOYMENT OF THE COMPANY OR THE NECESSITOUS WIDOWS, ORPHANS OR DEPENDENTS OF SUCH PERSONS. (C) THE MAKING OF GRANTS OR DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO ANY FUND ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE CITY OF LONDON OR ELSEWHERE. (D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNTIY NOT FALLING UNDER THE PRECEDING HEADS AS THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION AS DIRECTED BY ITS COURT OF ASSISTANTS THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Knox Cropper & Co
65 Leadenhall Street
London
EC3A 2AD
- Phone:
- 01747 851887
- Email:
- clerk@thegloverscompany.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window