6TH STAINES (CHRIST CHURCH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting related activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 April 1975: Standard registration
- 6TH STAINES (CHRISTCHURCH) SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- 6TH STAINES CHRISTCHURCH SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY STUART WATERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sharon Holmes | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
SIOBHAN O'NEILL | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Burley | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Batt | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Biggs | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diana Brown | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Syreeta Tranfield | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Pepall | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Emma Bashan | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brian Rosher | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Carol Belshaw | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY RIDLER | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
HARVEY HIEKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ANDREW BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEWART JOHN HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.69k | £38.59k | £24.04k | £21.60k | £38.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.05k | £20.92k | £22.49k | £33.16k | £27.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.34k | £12.76k | N/A | £9.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
STAINES
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 Brightside Avenue
Staines-upon-Thames
TW18 1NQ
- Phone:
- 07763203775
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window