Financial history DINDER VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 269110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.88k £20.18k £15.08k £22.73k £15.73k
Total expenditure £12.86k £31.94k £13.07k £15.65k £14.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.50k £18.17k £4.36k N/A N/A