THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION OXFORDSHIRE COUNTY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A huge number of varied activities are provided to all young members who follow the guiding programme at unit, district, division or county level. The emphasis is on teamwork, caring for the individual and decision making.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 17 April 1975: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING OXFORDSHIRE (Working name)
- GIRLGUIDING UK (Working name)
- OXFORDSHIRE COUNTY OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs S Cheetham | Chair | 03 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Megan Emily Woodland | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Letourneur | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Hudson | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ann Cruddis | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Francombe | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Cook | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Digby | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.26k | £80.38k | £68.81k | £44.98k | £40.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.02k | £51.42k | £42.01k | £39.48k | £47.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.68k | £16.57k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 14TH DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jubilee House
Horton Road
Stanton St. John
OXFORD
OX33 1AG
- Phone:
- 01865686151
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window