UCKFIELD (1944) HOME GUARD RIFLE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Target small bore rifle shooting. Target air rifle and air pistol shooting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 01 June 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN GEORGE FARRANT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robin Anthony Brown | Trustee | 10 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.06k | £12.09k | £4.24k | £9.00k | £9.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.34k | £12.99k | £10.50k | £9.45k | £9.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 May 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APRIL 1975 AND AMENDED ON 18TH JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE SKILL IN RIFLE SHOOTING BY PROVIDING INSTRUCTION AND PRACTICE IN THE USE OF THE SMALL-BORE RIFLE TO ANY OF HER MAJESTY'S SUBJECTS SO THAT THEY WILL BE BETTER FITTED TO SERVE THEIR COUNTRY IN THE ARMED FORCES, TERRITORIAL ARMY OR ANY OTHER ORGANISATION IN WHICH THEIR SERVICES MAY BE REQUIRED IN THE DEFENCE OF THE REALM IN TIMBES OF PERIL.
Area of benefit
EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Weald Edge
Little London Road
Horam
Heathfield
TN21 0BL
- Phone:
- 01435813383
- Email:
- uhgrc@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window