SAUNDERS WYNN AND COVENTRY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help children & young adults with educational needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 09 November 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Ridgeway | Chair | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Griffiths | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shane Mcallister | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Clive Arthur Hooker | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAME JOHN MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH POOLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.05k | £6.55k | £7.22k | £7.87k | £8.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £4.35k | £2.62k | £9.70k | £8.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 9 NOVEMBER 1988 as amended on 09 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
PROVIDING SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY PROMOTING EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER 25 WHO ARE OR HAVE ATTENDED THE SCHOOL OF THE CHARITY OR WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE A PARENT OR PARENTS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF CHADDLEWORTH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Montgomery Road
NEWBURY
RG14 6HU
- Phone:
- 07771392268
- Email:
- botmoorway@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window