PURITON VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall is available for the benefit of Puriton Village Residents. Regular user groups hire out the Hall on an hourly charge. Outsider and Private Party Bookings are also encouraged. The Hall provides local amenities, along with income to cover repairs and regular expenses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 09 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason West | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Katie Newell | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Kim Heathcote | Trustee | 10 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
DENISE EGGINGTON | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN SCOTT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.33k | £10.33k | £23.62k | £23.90k | £37.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.52k | £10.32k | £20.36k | £35.03k | £16.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £1.50k | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 24 April 2025 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 April 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 13 September 2021 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH MARCH 1937 AND VARIED BY THE SCHEME SEALED ON 29 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF PURITON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PRUITON AND ITS IMMEDIATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVERTON ROAD
PURITON
BRIDGWATER
TA7 8BP
- Phone:
- 07419842834
- Email:
- kimheathcote@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window