PINHOE RIFLE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Target Shooting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £1,875 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
129 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 26 June 1975: Standard registration
- PINHOE TARGET SHOOTING CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Bernard Taylor | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stanley Burrow | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Margaret Ann Agates | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Morgan Tansley Beard | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.82k | £120.28k | £64.64k | £128.67k | £63.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.10k | £93.85k | £178.82k | £130.44k | £89.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.80k | £26.86k | N/A | £1.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 January 2025 | 239 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2023 | 361 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 14 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 31 December 2020 | 214 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1945 AS AMENDED 19TH NOVEMBER 1974 as amended on 27 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE SKILL IN RIFLE SHOOTING BY PROVIDING INSTRUCTION AND PRACTICE IN THE USE OF THE SMALL-BORE RIFLE TO ANY OF HER MAJESTY'S SUBJECT SO THAT THEY WILL BE BETTER FITTED TO SERVE THEIR COUNTRY IN DEFENCE OF THE REALM IN TIMES OF PERIL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cyderpress Cottage
4 Old Bridwell
Uffculme
CULLOMPTON
Devon
EX15 3BU
- Phone:
- 07536114009
- Email:
- agateslindsay@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window