DRAYTON GRANGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drayton Grange Community Association is the business name for the management committee that manages Nene Hall, a community centre in Daventry. The aim of DGCA is to provide premises at a hire rate that is affordable and attractive to all users, while maintaining and improving the facilty. Regular users:- Nursery; Ballet; Ukulele; Scouts; Church; Stage School; Action for Children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 24 April 1975: Standard registration
- DGCA (Working name)
- NENE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL CASHMORE | Chair |
|
||||||
Wendy Randall | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Angela Squire | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Nicholl | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Charles Ross Mounteney | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.58k | £26.29k | £21.36k | £24.90k | £33.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.88k | £20.90k | £19.63k | £21.88k | £21.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 02 January 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH MARCH 1975
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF DRAYTON AND THE GRANGE ESTATE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF THE LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH MARCH 1975).
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF DRAYTON, THE GRANGE ESTATE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nene Hall
Tamar Square
Daventry
Northants
- Phone:
- 01327702701
- Email:
- mc24thelder@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window