Accounts and annual returns HALSE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 269301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 February 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required