Financial history HALSE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 269301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.44k £20.27k £29.14k £7.73k £30.02k
Total expenditure £7.88k £4.46k £33.60k £4.93k £19.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.67k £13.17k N/A N/A