Trustees HALSE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 269301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Emma von Bornsdorff Trustee 06 May 2025
None on record
Nichola Julia Ann Ellis Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Jill Payne Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Alison Jane Walker Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Carol Ann Windeatt Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record