Accounts and annual returns THE CHURCHES' COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CONSULTANCY

Charity number: 269319
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2015 07 June 2016 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2014 14 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 19 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required