HAVERING TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the blind, or partially blind, or those labouring under some temporary or permanent incapacity or disability, which makes reading a strain, by the provision of digitally prepared memory sticks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Havering
Governance
- 07 May 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gregory George Brome | Chair | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Timothy Foreman | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Andrew Lynch | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Joan Paolino | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Henry Pugh | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Bastin | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glynda Jean Davison | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Dorne Jane Steadman | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Verity Jean Brome BSc Hons | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN SPINK | Trustee | 10 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN BRACE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.88k | £1.51k | £111.90k | £200.37k | £25.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.02k | £2.85k | £9.74k | £4.34k | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ASIPTED 3RD APRIL 1975
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY BLIND OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
HAVERING L.B.
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Chestnut Avenue
Hornchurch
RM12 4HJ
- Phone:
- 01708453724
- Email:
- lizanddavespink@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window