THE PRIORY GUILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Priory Guild seeks to raise funds and receive donations. The Priory Guild supports Priory School (special needs). Priory School caters for 11-19 year old students with severe learning difficulties and autism. We support the mini-buses and give each class funds to access community facilities. We give support to students on free school meals to go on school journeys.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
Governance
- 22 May 1975: Standard registration
- 09 April 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 April 2016: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patroulla Lorke | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Clements-Fox | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Cunningham | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70 | £836 | £3.31k | £3 | £1.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £0 | £5.04k | £2.04k | £3.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 14 March 2024 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 22 June 2023 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 28 September 2020 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH MARCH 1975
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING PRIORY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOL IN ADDITION TO OR OF A DIFFERENT NATURE TO THOSE NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Priory School
Hermitage Road
LONDON
SE19 3QN
- Phone:
- 020 8653 8222
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window